SOVEREIGN PLACE TRUST

Charity number: 1112632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £22.95k £24.96k £24.82k £24.92k £23.76k
Total expenditure £23.39k £24.95k £24.85k £25.05k £23.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A