Trustees THE CHILDREN'S HOUSE SCHOOL
Charity number: 1113285
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIELLE ANOUK DUFEY | Chair | 10 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Mook | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Rachael Macfarlane | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Viola Fort | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Elizabeth Thornton | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Pitcher | Trustee | 14 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Zivanic | Trustee | 14 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Kingstone | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Butler Levine | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Farida El Gammal | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAWN MARIE BRINDLE | Trustee | 10 June 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.