Trustees SMETHWICK HERITAGE CENTRE TRUST
Charity number: 1117707
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth McLachlan | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Kathleen AllCOCK | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Allen | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Michael Baldwin | Trustee | 10 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
GEOFF CARPENTER | Trustee | 12 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARY CHRISTINE BODFISH | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.