4 PEACE OF MIND

Charity number: 1112720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £21.44k £17.04k £3.84k £5.63k £896
Total expenditure £28.50k £16.36k £3.70k £7.43k £1.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A