Trustees TRINITY CHURCH, BRENTWOOD
Charity number: 1112705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CASIAN VIRGIL SALA | Chair | 05 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Liviu Mercioniu | Trustee | 20 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Omolade Titilayo Oshunremi | Trustee | 20 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lelia Mae Bailey | Trustee | 20 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
WESLEY JONATHAN VAUGHAN | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
TIRRIAN SHARP | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER ANDREW WHEALY | Trustee | 05 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr JUAN DAVID ESQUIVEL | Trustee | 04 December 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.