LINCOLN CAT CARE

Charity number: 1114359
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £105.95k £114.91k £102.97k £70.14k £79.68k
Total expenditure £101.39k £92.34k £98.72k £137.12k £96.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £11.33k