BRENTFORD FC COMMUNITY SPORTS TRUST

Charity number: 1112784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.52m £1.77m £1.93m £1.92m £2.29m
Total expenditure £1.51m £1.68m £1.89m £1.98m £2.22m
Income from government contracts £418.13k £370.00k £90.00k £40.00k £140.00k
Income from government grants £27.50k £119.00k £171.54k £297.00k £304.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £103.56k £162.26k £166.44k £122.43k £231.85k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £580.24k £1.61m £1.71m £1.74m £2.06m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £159 £45 £144 £679 £992
Income - Other £837.70k £0 £52.94k £60.62k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.51m £1.67m £1.89m £1.98m £2.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £4.87k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £71.13k £5.82k £5.86k £5.86k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0