Financial history CHURCH WOOD CONSERVATION GROUP

Charity number: 1114068
Charity reporting is overdue by 481 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.06k £429 £1.15k £345 £545
Total expenditure £852 £563 £901 £1.56k £485
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A