Financial history THE CHRISTIAN MUSLIM FORUM

Charity number: 1114793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £27.54k £38.94k £68.57k £41.42k £24.01k
Total expenditure £43.65k £39.85k £51.64k £37.39k £21.58k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A