ST MARY'S CHEQUERFIELD COMMUNITY PROJECT LIMITED

Charity number: 1115477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £192.39k £178.71k £178.67k £168.25k £147.97k
Total expenditure £189.61k £192.39k £208.17k £214.35k £229.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £44.08k £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A