Trustees JFS DEVELOPMENT CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 1114730
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ISHAI NOVICK | Chair | 28 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT BRADLEY GERSHON | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr David Moody | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Howard John Pack | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Andrew Moss | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD KAFTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.