Financial history ACTIVE LIGHTWORKS LTD

Charity number: 1114800
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £6.30k £9.76k £8.82k £15.07k £291
Total expenditure £6.32k £8.32k £9.62k £9.45k £977
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A