CROSTON COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1113119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £32.10k £42.80k £19.84k £12.00k £8.64k
Total expenditure £8.61k £31.02k £13.10k £11.01k £8.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A