Accounts and annual returns DARWEN ACADEMY TRUST
Charity number: 1114250
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 03 August 2011 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 30 December 2010 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 06 December 2010 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 06 December 2010 | 159 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 15 September 2008 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | 12 November 2009 | 135 days late | |
Annual return | 31 January 2007 | 26 June 2008 | 209 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2007 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window