THE JAMESTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1115767
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 April 2021 163 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 April 2021 529 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 April 2021 894 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 12 April 2021 1259 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 24 May 2017 On time Download