Governing document THE BELTEX SHEEP SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/10/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/02/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/08/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/10/2011
Charitable objects
(A) (I) TO PROMOTE THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF AGRICULTURE BY ENCOURAGEMENT, PROMOTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE BREEDING OF BELTEX SHEEP AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE PURITY OF THE BREED IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. (II) TO ENCOURAGE, PROMOTE AND IMPROVE THE BREEDING OF BELTEX SHEEP TO ENSURE THE PRESERVATION OF THE BREED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. (III) TO UNDERTAKE RESEARCH ON SHEEP BREEDING AND MATTERS RELATING THERETO AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.