Trustees THE SOCIETY FOR THE PROTECTION OF ANCIENT BUILDINGS

Charity number: 1113753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charles Wagner Trustee 01 February 2024
None on record
Shona O'Keeffe Trustee 19 January 2024
None on record
Morwenna Rosalind Slade Trustee 24 July 2023
None on record
Georgina Nayler MBE Trustee 13 January 2022
None on record
Tyler Lott-Johnson Trustee 13 January 2022
None on record
Jo Thwaites Trustee 13 January 2022
None on record
Catherine Cullis Trustee 18 May 2020
FRIENDS OF FRIENDLESS CHURCHES LIMITED
Received: On time
Hazel Morris Trustee 18 May 2020
THE SURREY HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST LIMITED
Received: 9 days late
Christopher Wheaton Trustee 07 May 2019
None on record
Duncan McCallum Trustee 02 April 2019
None on record
Richard Max Trustee 30 June 2014
None on record
Mildred May Cookson Trustee
THE INTERNATIONAL MOLINOLOGICAL SOCIETY EDUCATIONAL TRUST FUND
Overdue by 229 days
THE MILLS ARCHIVE TRUST
Received: On time
WATLINGTON HOUSE TRUST
Received: On time