Financial history THE SANDHU CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1114236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £290.92k £376.29k £356.41k £359.12k £291.09k
Total expenditure £310.26k £316.43k £319.62k £332.45k £338.99k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A