Trustees EUROPARC ATLANTIC ISLES
Charity number: 1114189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID BUTTERWORTH | Chair | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hayden Bridgeman | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary-Jane Alexander | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Patrick Cormacan | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Lois Therese Mansfield | Trustee | 29 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Thompson | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Mary Swiers | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Jane Hopley | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anna Pollard MS | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Timothy David Duckmanton | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Dean | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Auld | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.