Financial history HEARTS OF OAK - THE OAK LODGE SCHOOL FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity number: 1115755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £77.35k £17.73k £43.52k £9.01k £23.47k
Total expenditure £26.89k £47.87k £31.60k £20.81k £13.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A