Financial history NEWHAM ALL STAR SPORTS ACADEMY

Charity number: 1114835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £190.32k £162.84k £180.08k £280.73k £361.29k
Total expenditure £198.58k £176.77k £187.25k £256.70k £382.44k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £6.62k N/A N/A N/A