Financial history CHILDREN AND FAMILIES LIMITED

Charity number: 1115459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.44m £1.34m £1.64m £1.90m £2.51m
Total expenditure £1.37m £1.34m £1.51m £1.71m £1.79m
Income from government contracts £238.00k £274.00k £202.30k £209.82k £229.61k
Income from government grants £29.15k £7.70k £25.73k £24.65k £295.35k
Income - Donations and legacies £7.57k £11.22k £8.51k £26.54k £162.86k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.37m £1.29m £1.60m £1.87m £2.35m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £479 £142 £906 £1.98k £0
Income - Other £63.18k £34.30k £28.16k £0 £5.91k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.37m £1.34m £1.51m £1.71m £1.79m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £20.76k £20.42k £20.09k £20.02k £19.42k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0