Financial history LONDON HIGHER

Charity number: 1114873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £1.44m £1.42m £1.58m £1.33m £1.02m
Total expenditure £1.42m £1.33m £1.57m £1.34m £1.03m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £352.60k £584.11k £559.11k £326.29k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.22m £1.41m £1.58m £1.33m £1.02m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.61k £3.01k £3.35k £2.06k £1.64k
Income - Other £213.81k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.42m £1.33m £1.57m £1.34m £1.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.18k £13.48k £13.18k £12.58k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0