VULVAL PAIN SOCIETY

Charity number: 1118118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £976 £4.13k £2.36k £9.91k £9.61k
Total expenditure £2.36k £2.70k £2.39k £7.91k £7.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A