Financial history ORA VESIMCHA

Charity number: 1115124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £180.68k £156.43k £203.98k £227.37k £117.16k
Total expenditure £245.43k £163.97k £200.81k £197.94k £99.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A