HARRIS GIRLS ACADEMY, EAST DULWICH

Charity number: 1115369
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2009 Overdue Overdue by 3967 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 Overdue Overdue by 3967 days
Annual return 31 August 2008 08 April 2009 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 30 June 2009 On time
Annual return 31 August 2007 29 May 2008 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 25 February 2008 On time