THE BARROW CADBURY TRUST

Charity number: 1115476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.95m £4.55m £4.21m £3.95m £8.48m
Total expenditure £4.90m £5.81m £7.50m £6.00m £11.51m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £17.00k £1.62m £1.60m £1.48m £6.59m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.93m £2.93m £2.61m £2.48m £1.89m
Income - Other £0 £1.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.54m £5.44m £7.13m £5.64m £11.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds £360.00k £370.00k £372.00k £367.00k £414.00k
Expenditure - Governance £66.00k £60.00k £64.00k £65.00k £46.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.34m £4.14m £5.40m £3.93m £9.43m
Expenditure - Investment management £360.00k £370.00k £372.00k £367.00k £414.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0