Financial history CAMEL ESTUARY YOUTH SAILING

Charity number: 1116121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £6.59k £9.95k £16.70k £3.90k £11.25k
Total expenditure £10.92k £10.75k £8.39k £1.05k £11.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A