Financial history CHRYSALIS (CUMBRIA) LTD

Charity number: 1116125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.17m £1.42m £1.51m £1.59m £1.29m
Total expenditure £1.20m £1.33m £1.45m £1.51m £1.40m
Income from government contracts £736.17k £992.54k £1.12m £1.25m £1.06m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £134.95k £82.31k
Income - Donations and legacies £65.78k £32.52k £16.51k £247.22k £96.61k
Income - Other trading activities £36.80k £34.85k £38.16k £21.77k £25.66k
Income - Charitable activities £1.06m £1.35m £1.45m £1.32m £1.16m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.08k £1.35k £2.28k £739 £625
Income - Other £162 £162 £1.13k £15 £2.04k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.15m £1.27m £1.39m £1.46m £1.35m
Expenditure - Raising funds £48.18k £52.49k £64.00k £50.65k £51.86k
Expenditure - Governance £26.23k £6.48k £10.90k £9.24k £7.17k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0