Accounts and annual returns THE INTERNATIONAL CENTRE FOR INTEGRATIVE EMOTIONAL THERAPY

Charity number: 1126692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required