THE CHARLES AND ALISON MCGREGOR CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1116047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 20 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required