THE SHAFTESBURY CHRISTIAN CENTRE BATTERSEA

Charity number: 1116087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £72.75k £61.17k £52.32k £61.72k £85.16k
Total expenditure £51.60k £59.10k £61.75k £58.90k £62.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A