Trustees ASPIRE OXFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY ENTERPRISE LIMITED
Charity number: 1117726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Hubert Powlett Smith | Chair | 19 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Margaret Brown | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Rowe | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Roy Blackburn | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sophie Barnett | Trustee | 19 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Richardson | Trustee | 31 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew Victor Staines | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Ernest Blowfield | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Dick | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.