Trustees RODING VALLEY UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)
Charity number: 1116143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sara Jonquil Day | Trustee | 18 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Witherick | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Roy Linnell | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Richard Rowles | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Steinberg | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Keith Forrest | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Kim Blake | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CHRISTIAN QUAIFE | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.