FRIENDS OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, BALDOCK

Charity number: 1117542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £29.21k £11.57k £14.60k £14.76k £10.31k
Total expenditure £11.42k £21.74k £3.70k £2.95k £2.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A