HARROGATE AND DISTRICT FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1116276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.63k £1.42k £1.28k £1.07k £874
Total expenditure £1.65k £1.47k £1.53k £1.17k £204
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A