Financial history AR-RAHMAH

Charity number: 1121296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £604.93k £745.35k £420.48k £503.64k £174.89k
Total expenditure £895.85k £520.04k £332.36k £300.41k £98.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £594.02k £736.09k N/A £503.64k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £10.91k £9.26k N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £819.79k £424.83k N/A £220.70k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £76.05k £95.21k N/A £79.71k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 N/A £4.72k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £762.43k £366.78k N/A £160.99k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A