Trustees WHIXLEY AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY CRICKET CLUB
Charity number: 1120877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jack Witham | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steven Webster | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Lumb | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Mason | Trustee | 30 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Forster | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Richardson Captain | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Harvey Treasurer | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hooper | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Richardson Chairman | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Webster Captain | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Greenwood TrustChair | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER HAWKRIDGE | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES JOSEPH BAINES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAIN PETER RICHARDSON Secretary | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEWART WITHAM Groundsman | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.