CAVES UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity number: 1116786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.84k £3.87k £4.11k £10.18k £6.59k
Total expenditure £3.37k £3.50k £3.70k £9.73k £6.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A