POA WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 1117527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £203.27k £318.02k £427.03k £420.57k £425.65k
Total expenditure £190.54k £249.25k £232.74k £261.25k £240.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A