ILAYS

Charity number: 1118016
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £21.16k £37.77k £19.17k £29.81k £26.92k
Total expenditure £13.24k £24.28k £32.26k £29.20k £24.22k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £18.29k £16.62k £9.17k £14.81k £14.30k