MUSLIM YOUTHWORK FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1122273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £0 £21 £10.00k £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.18k £734 £7.39k £2.68k £3.53k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A