AAWAZ SOUTHWARK ASIAN WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1121060
Charity reporting is overdue by 1696 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 235 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 235 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 601 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 601 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 966 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 966 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1331 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1331 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1696 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1696 days