Trustees MODERN POETRY IN TRANSLATION LIMITED
Charity number: 1118223
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew James George KC | Chair | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
CATRIONA ISABEL WHITE | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Susannah Mary Herbert | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Tennant | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Priscilla Shashikala Trevett | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Robert Smardon | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Farah Jane Mendlesohn | Trustee | 29 March 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.