Financial history TAMESIDE CANAL BOAT TRUST

Charity number: 1119622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.60k £6.58k £4.30k £6.85k £3.54k
Total expenditure £15.74k £9.70k £13.32k £14.08k £7.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A