Trustees SOUTH WYE DEVELOPMENT TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1117770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARTHUR CHRISTOPHER RICHARD CHAPPELL | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nick Small | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Tillett | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
June Griffiths | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Franca Lane | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hilda Patricia Gordon | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Penny Southwood | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL RONE | Trustee | 02 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.