ST MARKS PTA WORSLEY

Charity number: 1117346
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £18.29k £18.81k £24.44k £16.28k £3.33k
Total expenditure £13.37k £7.97k £26.21k £17.32k £1.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A