Financial history THE BEVERIDGE HERPETOLOGICAL TRUST

Charity number: 1118017
Charity reporting is overdue by 30 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £16.94k £19.32k £18.53k £45.46k £11.59k
Total expenditure £38.21k £8.29k £13.74k £80.79k £8.35k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A