Financial history PLAY BRADFORD

Charity number: 1122592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £230.70k £206.11k £309.13k £394.20k £297.76k
Total expenditure £185.68k £233.46k £265.84k £248.27k £304.20k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £34.71k £10.00k £5.53k £6.18k £25.23k