PARENTS AND FRIENDS OF ST PAUL'S C E SCHOOL BRIGHTON

Charity number: 1119280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £11.27k £12.50k £13.52k £15.98k £7.46k
Total expenditure £11.42k £7.42k £5.17k £4.80k £3.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A